Accounts and annual returns LIFE UPLIFTED BY CHANGE IN AFRICA

Charity number: 1112674
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2017 30 August 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2016 20 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2015 29 November 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 01 December 2015 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2014 30 November 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2014 Not Required