Accounts and annual returns DIVCON

Charity Number: 1112139
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2012 30 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2011 30 October 2012 122 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2010 19 August 2011 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2010 Not Required