Accounts and annual returns WRAP WILMCOTE RECREATION AND PLAY

Charity Number: 1115330
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2012 17 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2011 09 June 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2010 24 September 2011 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2009 28 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 Not Required