Financial history LONGVIEW

Charity number: 1114094
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2007 30/09/2008 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011
Total gross income £150.00k £330.91k £225.63k £92.66k £39.68k
Total expenditure £145.59k £261.12k £288.39k £133.04k £87.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A