Accounts and annual returns SHARED VOICES

Charity number: 1112251
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2013 05 June 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 August 2012 10 July 2013 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2012 10 July 2013 10 days late
Annual return 31 August 2011 22 May 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2011 Not Required