Financial history YARNTON MEDICAL PRACTICE TRUST FUND

Charity Number: 1115032
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2009 31/01/2010 31/01/2011 31/01/2012 31/01/2013
Total gross income £1.44k £3.76k £3.76k £1.78k £1.98k
Total expenditure £0 £5.56k £5.56k £1.01k £1.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A