Accounts and annual returns TIPTREE COMMUNITY CENTRE TRUST
Charity Number: 1112456
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 03 October 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | 01 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 07 April 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 24 March 2008 | 145 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | 16 April 2008 | 168 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window