Financial history LIVING LIFE (EASTBOURNE)

Charity Number: 1113145
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £13.99k £10.21k £9.36k £77.99k £64.32k
Total expenditure £12.93k £9.09k £8.37k £45.57k £55.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £7.00k N/A