Accounts and annual returns SEWALANKA UK

Charity number: 1118050
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2016 14 March 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2015 01 March 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2014 12 February 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2014 Not Required