Accounts and annual returns EUROPEAN TAX POLICY FORUM

Charity number: 1116013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 June 2024 07 May 2025 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 04 July 2024 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 26 September 2023 330 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 26 September 2023 330 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window