Financial history BASINGSTOKE BLUEFINS SWIMMING CLUB

Charity number: 1114225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £368.61k £270.16k £223.16k £386.88k £454.97k
Total expenditure £437.57k £213.45k £177.85k £253.62k £357.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £23.91k N/A N/A