Financial history DERBYSHIRE GRITSTONE SHEEP BREEDERS SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity Number: 1114914
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £3.31k £3.30k £3.37k £4.81k £3.37k
Total expenditure £2.11k £1.00k £1.73k £1.73k £1.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A