Financial history THE STABLE (BARNET)

Charity number: 1112767
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £36.03k £24.64k £33.91k £44.58k £40.96k
Total expenditure £38.47k £33.86k £32.91k £40.55k £41.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A