Financial history LIVING WORD INTERNATIONAL CHURCH (ENGLAND)

Charity number: 1113936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £200.11k £211.96k £214.08k £202.03k £187.41k
Total expenditure £180.78k £150.51k £170.48k £183.72k £177.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A