Financial history INCLUSION VENTURES LIMITED

Charity Number: 1113939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £344.20k £550.22k £654.95k £331.71k £408.51k
Total expenditure £272.75k £327.74k £673.48k £356.20k £436.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.83k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £957 £1.39k N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £548.21k £0 N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £54 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £994 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £327.74k £673.48k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £2.66k N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A