Financial history KEREN ERETZ YISROEL

Charity number: 1112935
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £40.65k £30.31k £26.40k £33.67k £30.48k
Total expenditure £35.56k £45.49k £21 £56.20k £25.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A