Financial history NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF CHRISTIAN SURVIVORS OF SEXUAL ABUSE (CSSA NATIONAL)

Charity Number: 1113846
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011
Total gross income £1.14k £1.53k £294 £684 £2.07k
Total expenditure £2.76k £3.78k £1.80k £2.98k £1.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A