Financial history TALIA TRUST FOR CHILDREN UK

Charity number: 1113343
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £10.23k £15.35k £3.31k £8.45k £4.81k
Total expenditure £10.10k £10.38k £112 £6.42k £8.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A