Accounts and annual returns OLD BRIDGE (SALEM) GOSPEL MISSION

Charity number: 1115045
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 22 December 2024 03 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 22 December 2023 11 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 22 December 2022 28 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 22 December 2021 16 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 22 December 2020 17 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 22 December 2020 Not Required