Financial history THE GARY WOODWARD DYSKERATOSIS CONGENITA TRUST

Charity number: 1113617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £343 £200 £401 £16 £853
Total expenditure £707 £658 £791 £623 £1.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A