Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF DOWNE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1114054
Charity reporting is overdue by 500 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 133 days
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 133 days
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 500 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 500 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 18 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 March 2020 18 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 14 August 2019 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required