Accounts and annual returns AFIKIM - THE ISRAEL FAMILY ENRICHMENT ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1113173
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2011 | 22 May 2012 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2011 | 22 May 2012 | 146 days late | |
Annual return | 28 February 2010 | 01 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2010 | 01 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 28 February 2009 | 12 July 2010 | 196 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2009 | 30 December 2009 | 2 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window