Financial history WARRINGTON ISLAMIC ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1116745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £144.20k £77.37k £145.09k £187.82k £192.71k
Total expenditure £109.51k £35.91k £108.59k £154.35k £273.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A