Accounts and annual returns OUTWARD BOUND OMAN UK

Charity number: 1113323
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 30 November 2016 11 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2015 30 September 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2015 11 October 2016 11 days late
Annual return 30 September 2014 29 July 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2014 12 June 2015 On Time