Accounts and annual returns UK CMC (UK CHRISTIAN MUSIC CHARTS)

Charity number: 1114503
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 January 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 30 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2015 17 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required