Financial history HELP UNLIMITED

Charity Number: 1114088
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £2.94k £6.27k £3.35k £3.58k £6.15k
Total expenditure £1.31k £5.14k £6.07k £3.69k £5.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A