Trustees CHARTHAM VILLAGE HALL MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE
Charity number: 1113522

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROL Ann MANNING | Chair | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHLOE LEES | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Austen | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valery Elvidge | Trustee | 21 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES SPRINGHAM | Trustee | 07 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Richard George Sims | Trustee | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
STEPHANIE DUNGAY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.