Financial history PARK HALL PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1116409
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/09/2007 27/09/2009 27/09/2010 27/09/2011 27/09/2012
Total gross income £5.89k £7.76k £8.25k £5.55k £7.46k
Total expenditure £3.77k £4.63k £9.23k £7.25k £4.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A