Accounts and annual returns K SPORTS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1114781
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 02 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 02 November 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2022 29 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 29 September 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2021 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 18 October 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 May 2020 01 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 01 February 2021 On Time