Financial history YOUNG LIVES

Charity Number: 1114745
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £766.31k £1.07m £1.22m £1.22m £1.91m
Total expenditure £771.23k £1.01m £1.08m £1.19m £1.98m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £91.86k £564.84k £83.66k £166.57k £161.38k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £5.99k
Income - Charitable activities £620.95k £490.41k £1.13m £1.04m £1.73m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.44k £17.18k £7.62k £7.75k £10.96k
Income - Other £41.06k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £766.31k £991.41k £1.07m £1.17m £1.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.92k £14.65k £6.93k £18.93k £15.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0