Accounts and annual returns WARWICKSHIRE WELFARE RIGHTS ADVICE SERVICE

Charity number: 1113524
Charity reporting is up to date (44 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 12 September 2024 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 12 September 2024 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 22 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required