Accounts and annual returns WILMSLOW ADVANCED MOTORISTS

Charity Number: 1113682
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2011 11 February 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2011 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2010 29 November 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2010 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2009 21 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2009 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2008 08 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 Not Required