Financial history SURVIVE SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND BRISTOL

Charity number: 1114005
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018
Total gross income £686.66k £721.55k £719.91k £631.61k £207.08k
Total expenditure £660.29k £709.56k £674.11k £697.85k £318.13k
Income from government contracts N/A £371.97k £348.69k £351.45k £0
Income from government grants N/A £39.46k £0 £0 £111.88k
Income - Donations and legacies £15.11k £9.16k £12.98k £23.11k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £17.93k £18.87k £29.49k £14.97k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £653.34k £693.03k £676.96k £593.36k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £283 £487 £481 £173 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £656.18k £704.66k £673.80k £697.80k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £313 £50 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £3.36k £3.66k £3.66k £2.34k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A