Financial history ST EDWARD'S PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1114187
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2007 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011
Total gross income £31.98k £32.23k £42.25k £33.63k £50.09k
Total expenditure £31.49k £36.89k £33.63k £42.25k £43.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A