Accounts and annual returns GLENDALE SPORTS & LEISURE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1113747
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2009 09 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2008 25 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2007 12 March 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2006 02 August 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2006 02 August 2007 On Time