Trustees THE FRIENDS OF MAWSLEY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1114936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Donna-Marie Skingle Trustee 17 December 2024
None on record
Pooja Hirani Trustee 16 May 2024
None on record
Keris Edwards Trustee 19 October 2021
None on record
Maria Victoria Mateos Nieves Trustee 19 October 2021
None on record
Claire Cornick Lord Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Joanne Thornton Trustee 14 October 2020
None on record
Nicola Jane Munro Clode Trustee 24 April 2019
None on record