Accounts and annual returns THE MARTIN AND EUGENIA EPHSON EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1114142
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 18 November 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 10 January 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 02 February 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required