Accounts and annual returns INFINITE WISDOM

Charity number: 1117037
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 04 April 2009 31 August 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2008 10 September 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2008 Not Required