Accounts and annual returns THE FOOTSTEPS PARENTS GROUP

Charity number: 1115667
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2012 26 April 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 18 April 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 03 June 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2009 17 April 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2009 Not Required