Financial history AFRICAN UNITY PROJECT GB

Charity number: 1114327
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £210 £0 £500 £1.50k £150
Total expenditure £192 £0 £300 £600 £100
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A