Financial history THE BARBARA PARKER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1114462
Removed charity

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2007 05/04/2008 05/04/2009 05/04/2010 05/04/2011
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A