Accounts and annual returns CHEKA (CARE, HEALTH & EDUCATION FOR KIDS IN AFRICA)

Charity number: 1114791
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 April 2010 27 July 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2010 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2009 27 July 2010 173 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2009 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2008 30 December 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2008 Not Required
Annual return 04 April 2007 16 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 04 April 2007 Not Required