Financial history OASIS GLOBAL TRUST

Charity number: 1114610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.00k £9.80k £16.96k £22.74k £24.96k
Total expenditure £10.41k £16.17k £13.78k £19.40k £17.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A