Financial history THE FRIENDS OF KINGSWODE HOE SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1114517
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £56.08k £55.76k £56.98k £56.40k £1.80k
Total expenditure £3.51k £835 £725 £1.03k £1.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A