Accounts and annual returns MARESA VON STOCKERT LIMITED

Charity number: 1114836
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 24 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 February 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required