Accounts and annual returns SAVE THE AMAZON RAINFOREST ORGANISATION LTD
Charity number: 1116002
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 31 July 2009 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 01 September 2008 | 33 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window