Financial history NATIONAL LITERACY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1115676
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2008 31/08/2009 31/08/2010 31/08/2011 31/08/2012
Total gross income £28.79k £20.00k £200 £100 £5.26k
Total expenditure £33.92k £26.13k £5.06k £6.71k £11.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A