Financial history CHATHAM GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR BOYS (SCHOOL FUND)

Charity number: 1114935
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £268.66k £280.16k £258.57k £237.73k £282.49k
Total expenditure £250.56k £287.64k £275.48k £290.34k £193.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A