Financial history RIPPLES FOUNDATION UK

Charity Number: 1116698
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2013 30/09/2014 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017
Total gross income £151.51k £211.30k £286.78k £191.70k £0
Total expenditure £135.37k £208.88k £296.87k £241.74k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0