Accounts and annual returns PROGERIA UK

Charity number: 1115846
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 26 February 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 26 February 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 26 February 2016 25 December 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 26 February 2016 Not Required
Annual return 26 February 2015 18 January 2016 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 26 February 2015 Not Required
Annual return 26 February 2014 24 April 2015 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 26 February 2014 Not Required